43
bh global marine LIMITED
ANNUAL REPORT 2012
3 Directors’ interest in shares or debentures (cont’d)
Number of ordinary shares
Shareholdings
registered in their
own names
Shareholdings in which
a director is deemed
to have an interest
At 1.1.2012 At 31.12.2012 At 1.1.2012 At 31.12.2012
Subsidiaries
PT. BH Marine & Offshore Engineering
Alvin Lim Hwee Hong
–
–
2,000
2,000
Vincent Lim Hui Eng
–
–
2,000
2,000
Patrick Lim Hui Peng
–
–
2,000
2,000
GL Lighting International Pte. Ltd.
Alvin Lim Hwee Hong
–
–
210,000
210,000
Vincent Lim Hui Eng
–
–
210,000
210,000
Patrick Lim Hui Peng
–
–
210,000
210,000
PT. Dwi Utama Mandiri Sukses
Alvin Lim Hwee Hong
–
–
250
250,000
Vincent Lim Hui Eng
–
–
250
250,000
Patrick Lim Hui Peng
–
–
250
250,000
Gulf Specialty Steel Industries LLC
Alvin Lim Hwee Hong
–
–
1,020,000
2,182,800
Vincent Lim Hui Eng
–
–
1,020,000
2,182,800
Patrick Lim Hui Peng
–
–
1,020,000
2,182,800
Dalian Nautical Offshore & Marine Technologies Co., Ltd
Alvin Lim Hwee Hong
–
–
–
525,000*
Vincent Lim Hui Eng
–
–
–
525,000*
Patrick Lim Hui Peng
–
–
–
525,000*
*
Represents capital injected in RMB.
The deemed interests of Alvin Lim Hwee Hong, Vincent Lim Hui Eng and Patrick Lim Hui Peng in the shares of the
Company are by virtue of their shareholdings in Beng Hui Holding (S) Pte Ltd. At 31 December 2012, Beng Hui Holding
(S) Pte Ltd holds 286,675,600 shares in the Company.
By virtue of Section 7(4) of the Companies Act, Cap. 50, the directors Alvin Lim Hwee Hong, Vincent Lim Hui Eng
and Patrick Lim Hui Peng are deemed to have an interest in shares held by the Company in all of its wholly-owned
subsidiaries.
(b) The directors’ interests in the shares of the Company at 21 January 2013 were the same at 31 December 2012.
DIRECTORS’ REPORT
(CONT’D)